U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10159-
  • Case Name: ANDREW LEE SHOUGH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
November, 2020
  • November 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
October, 2020
  • October 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • October 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
September, 2020
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
August, 2020
  • August 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.