U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40086
  • Case Name: WILLIAM EUGENE FENNER and BETTY LAVERN FENNER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
December, 2022
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • May 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • May 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Turnover]
  • March 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • March 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • January 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Participate in FSA Program]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
  • December 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in FSA Program]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 12 Plan]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Expedite Hearing]
  • November 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • November 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
  • November 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.