U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20197-
  • Case Name: GAYLE LYNN STEINBACH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • October 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • October 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
April, 2021
  • April 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • April 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Vacating Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case to Administer Assets]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Trustee's Motion to Reopen Chapter 7 Case to Administer Assets]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.