U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10113-
  • Case Name: MONTY BRAUNSTADTER and DELORIS BRAUNSTADTER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
  • February 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch. 13 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
January, 2021
  • January 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.