U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90141-
  • Case Name: BRIAN EUGENE WALKER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ntc Ch 7 Closed w/o Discharge]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Close Ch 7 Case Without Discharge]
September, 2020
  • September 06, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Time]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.