U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40090-
  • Case Name: ALECIA D GRIFFIN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • October 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
May, 2021
  • May 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case to Administer Assets]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Trustee's Motion to Reopen Chapter 7 Case to Administer Assets]
December, 2020
  • December 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
November, 2020
  • November 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
September, 2020
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.