U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90159-
  • Case Name: THOMAS JOHN AMAYA, SR and KATHY JOANN AMAYA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
September, 2020
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • September 05, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2020
  • August 30, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.