U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-60076-
  • Case Name: ERICA RAE STROH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • January 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reopen Case]
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Reopen Case - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.