U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90202-
  • Case Name: DAVID ISAAC VAINIO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Overdue Installment Fee]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.