U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90207-
  • Case Name: TRENA RENEE GARRISON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Avoid Lien]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Avoid Judicial Lien]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reopen Case]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Reopen Case - BK]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.