U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20153-
  • Case Name: MORGAN PETT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Extend Time to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.