U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-ap-09008-
  • Case Name: DRUMMOND v. CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 06, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 03, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 24, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 22, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • October 22, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
  • October 18, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • October 16, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.