U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10132-
  • Case Name: KATHRINA M JOB
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Modification of Plan]
September, 2022
  • September 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
August, 2022
  • August 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
June, 2022
  • June 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
August, 2021
  • August 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [ BNC Certificiate of Mailing - Order Approving Modification of Plan]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Plan]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • June 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
February, 2021
  • February 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice of Claim Filing Pursuant to Rule 3004]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.