U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10140-
  • Case Name: KHAN REAL ESTATE LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Final Decree]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Final Decree]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Disclosure Statement]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Objection to Claim]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • October 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reconsider]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Motion]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Reconsider - BK]
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Reconsider - BK]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • September 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s)]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.