U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10081-
  • Case Name: LEON GARCIA and TAMMY ANN GARCIA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • June 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
February, 2022
  • February 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compel]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compel]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacate]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Vacate]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
September, 2020
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.