U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40054-
  • Case Name: ANDREA CROWELL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.