U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90090-
  • Case Name: KELLA JUNE BABCOCK
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Final Decree]
  • May 16, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Final Decree]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 15, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • October 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Sell]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • September 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Shorten Time]
  • September 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • September 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • August 17, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • August 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Vacate Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Shorten Time]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
  • May 09, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Entered in Error - BK]
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Converting Case]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Individual/Joint)]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case 13 to 11]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Shorten Time]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Convert Chapter 13 to Chapter 11]
  • January 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • September 05, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.