U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90158-
  • Case Name: BARRY JOHN BURGHARDT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignment/Transfer of Claim]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.