U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40067-
  • Case Name: THERON OWEN PAULSEN and SARA JEAN PAULSEN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Dismiss Case]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.