U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40075-
  • Case Name: GREGORY DALE WYLES and BROOKE MICHELLE WYLES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • September 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
August, 2021
  • August 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • August 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • August 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Entered in Error - BK]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Vacating Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.