U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-ap-01007-
  • Case Name: TOTAL RENAL CARE INC. v. GONZALEZ-TRAPAGA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • December 29, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • December 29, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
  • December 29, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • December 11, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 25, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • November 25, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
  • November 20, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion for Summary Judgment - ADV]
  • November 11, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • November 09, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
  • November 06, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 04, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • November 04, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 04, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 02, 2020: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.