U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20160-
  • Case Name: BETTER THAN LOGS INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2021
  • December 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Correspondence]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Converting Case]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Convert Case 11 to 7]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Convert Case 11 to 7]
  • July 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Convert Case Chapter 11 to Chapter 7]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion - BK]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion - BK]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [2004 Examination]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Complaints Deadline]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Time]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • September 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.