U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-po-05054-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Baghi
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • December 16, 2020: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • December 16, 2020: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • December 12, 2020: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • December 10, 2020: [Vacate]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order Setting - MTD]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • September 21, 2020: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • September 17, 2020: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • September 02, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.