U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-po-05053-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Avileszuniga
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • September 23, 2020: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • September 23, 2020: [Quash ]
  • September 21, 2020: [Add Disposition Text]
  • September 21, 2020: [Remark - MT]
  • September 19, 2020: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • September 17, 2020: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • September 02, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.