U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90137-
  • Case Name: CRAIG SCOTT WITTE and ROBERTA SUSAN WITTE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • November 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Ballot Report]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
September, 2020
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 06, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.