U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-mj-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Transfer Letter - MT]
  • March 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2020: [Docket Call]
  • October 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2020: [Rule 5 Documents Other District Deft - SDM]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 30, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 30, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 08, 2020: [Arrest - Rule 5 - SDM]
  • September 08, 2020: [Rule 5 Documents Other District Deft - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.