U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90126-
  • Case Name: ROBERT WAYNE TREZONA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 13 Case]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice for Motion for Discharge]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 17, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Deeming Claim Satisfied (Hearing Required)]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 13)]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch. 13 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.