U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-ap-02012-
  • Case Name: BOUDETTE n/k/a OSKERSON v. BOUDETTE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 10, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held Non-evidentiary]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • October 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
September, 2021
  • September 26, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • September 26, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • September 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Memorandum of Decision - AD]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • June 16, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply to Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • May 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Summary Judgment - ADV]
  • May 06, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 04, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • May 04, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • May 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Protective Order - ADV]
  • April 17, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 16, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer]
  • April 15, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 09, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • March 06, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
  • March 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Compel - ADV]
  • March 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
  • March 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Notice - BK]
February, 2021
  • February 21, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • February 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • February 12, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 27, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • December 11, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
  • December 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 08, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • November 06, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 06, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ]
  • November 06, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judicial Notice]
  • September 29, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • September 25, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • September 24, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 11, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • September 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.