U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20177-
  • Case Name: LYNNIS CLINTON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Notice - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.