U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10110-
  • Case Name: BILLINGS LODGE, NO. 394, BENEVOLENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER OF ELKS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
  • November 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • October 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
August, 2021
  • August 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • July 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • June 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • May 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Ballot Report]
  • May 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice - BK]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Ch. 11 Plan Confirmation Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement and Setting Ch. 11 Plan Confirmation Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Redact]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Consolidate]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • September 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • September 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.