U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90194-
  • Case Name: KENNY ROGER JACKSON and STEFANI KRISTINE JACKSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2021
  • July 17, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
November, 2020
  • November 22, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Time]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.