U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40093-
  • Case Name: DENNIS EUGENE OLSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Close Ch 7 Case Without Discharge]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.