U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-po-05084-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Keith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • September 21, 2020: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Add Disposition Text]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order - MTD]
  • September 17, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • September 17, 2020: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.