U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20188-
  • Case Name: MATHEW L HOOKER and SADIE M HOOKER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2021
  • December 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
December, 2020
  • December 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reaffirmation Agreement - Pro se]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement (ProSe)]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.