U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90219-
  • Case Name: GEORGE EDWARDS ANDRES and GINA MARIE ANDRES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • December 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
November, 2020
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2020
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Redact]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Redact (Fee Per Case)]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.