U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90164-
  • Case Name: MICHAEL LEROY BLEDSOE and DANIELLE LEIGH BLEDSOE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignmen/Transfer of Claim]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • October 04, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.