U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-po-05060-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Click
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • January 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Minute Entry - MT]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • October 08, 2020: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order - MTD]
  • October 06, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • October 03, 2020: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • October 03, 2020: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.