U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90190-
  • Case Name: THOMAS JOHN SCHNEIDER and ANGELA RUTH SCHNEIDER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 09, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • April 11, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 28, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compensation]
  • March 28, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
February, 2022
  • February 06, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Administrative Expenses]
  • February 04, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Administrative Expenses]
June, 2021
  • June 27, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Employ]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Employ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compensation]
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • April 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Sell]
  • April 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Shorten Time]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • April 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Sale of Property]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Expedited Order for Sale of Property]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Expedited Sale of Property]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
January, 2021
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Employ]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Employ]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.