U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40098-
  • Case Name: RAYMOND ANTONE LUTHER and GENESTA LEE LUTHER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 12 Case]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Hearing Terminated - Text Only]
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
  • July 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • July 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • July 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Sell]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • July 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • July 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Shorten Time]
  • July 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
  • June 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Interim Fees]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Interim Fees]
April, 2021
  • April 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • March 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [2004 Examination]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • January 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Participate in FSA Program]
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • December 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Turnover]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in FSA Program]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
October, 2020
  • October 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.