U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-bk-20165-
  • Case Name: CARL THOMAS PAULL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Delay Discharge]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Complaints Deadline]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Delay Discharge]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.