U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-ap-02013-
  • Case Name: Concrete Log Systems, Inc. dba Everlog Systems v. BETTER THAN LOGS INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
  • July 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 02, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Notice - ADV]
  • July 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • July 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • June 23, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • June 23, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • June 13, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • June 13, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 13, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Memorandum of Decision - AD]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Continue Hearing - ADV]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply to Motion]
  • February 18, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 16, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Judicial Notice]
  • February 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion for Summary Judgment - ADV]
  • February 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion - BK]
  • February 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
January, 2021
  • January 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 22, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 21, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • November 16, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
  • November 16, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • November 12, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 10, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.