U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90155-
  • Case Name: BRENTON JAMES DEGARMO and KYLEE MARIE DEGARMO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • July 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Time]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • October 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.