U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-ap-09007-
  • Case Name: SCHLIEPER et al v. MONTANA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 15, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
February, 2021
  • February 13, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • January 04, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Strike - ADV]
  • January 04, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion for More Definite Statement]
  • January 01, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 30, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • December 26, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion for Default Judgment]
  • December 26, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion for Entry of Default]
  • December 25, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 23, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 17, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service]
  • December 15, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 18, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • October 16, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Vacate]
  • October 12, 2020: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.