U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40084-
  • Case Name: STEVEN CRAIG JACKSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Turnover of Property]
January, 2021
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Complaints Deadline]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Delay Discharge]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.