U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40101-
  • Case Name: PATRICK GALE RAINS and GAYLA JOHNSTON RAINS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
November, 2020
  • November 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
October, 2020
  • October 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.