U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10186-
  • Case Name: SERGIO ARTURO VALDEZ SALAS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.