U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40102-
  • Case Name: TODD CURTIS SOUTHLAND
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Compensation]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Objection to Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • March 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Denying Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 12 Plan]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • February 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • February 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Denying Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 12 Plan]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
January, 2021
  • January 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Approving]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Participate in FSA Program]
  • December 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Participate in FSA Program]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Employ]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion to Employ]
October, 2020
  • October 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Change Venue]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Add Judge]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.