U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40103
  • Case Name: ROBERT DONALD BROWN and TRACIE ANTONETTE BROWN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Discharging Debtor(s) After Completion of Plan in a Chapter 12 Case]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion for Entry of Discharge]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Entry of Discharge and Attorney Certification]
  • September 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
  • September 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
March, 2022
  • March 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • February 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Sell]
  • February 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
  • August 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • August 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • August 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
May, 2021
  • May 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • April 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Vacating Order]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • March 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
  • February 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
  • January 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Participate in FSA Program]
  • December 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in FSA Program]
November, 2020
  • November 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12 (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.