U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:20-bk-90179-
  • Case Name: STEVE B THORSON and LEIGH A. HOLDEMAN-THORSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 24, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Sale of Property]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Sale of Property]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.