U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-bk-40104-
  • Case Name: ROBIN LEE STROH and LISA JEAN STROH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • July 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • June 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Compensation]
  • June 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
May, 2021
  • May 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • May 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • May 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • May 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Sell]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Shorten Time]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
  • April 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • April 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 07, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Chapter 12 Plan Pre-Confirmation Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Participate in FSA Program]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Participate in FSA Program]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • December 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Employ]
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.